Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/15/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/15/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/15/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/22/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/22/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/22/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/03/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/14/2001