Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/15/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/15/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/27/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/29/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/20/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/20/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/20/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/11/2001