Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/19/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/21/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 03/21/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/21/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/21/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/21/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/21/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/29/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/03/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/26/2001