Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/19/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/29/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/29/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/01/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/01/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/08/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/14/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/14/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/14/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/14/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/14/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/22/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/22/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/22/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/12/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/12/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/19/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/19/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/20/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/20/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/20/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/25/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/25/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/25/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/10/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/10/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/17/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/17/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/18/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/18/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/18/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/24/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/24/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/25/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/25/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/31/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/31/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/31/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/31/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 08/02/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/02/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/04/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/04/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/04/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/10/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/13/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/13/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 11/13/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 12/05/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/11/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 01/23/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/23/2002
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/23/2002
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/06/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/06/2002
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/06/2002
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/06/2002
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/06/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 02/06/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/13/2002
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/13/2002
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/13/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/13/2002
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/20/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/18/2002
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/18/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2002
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/23/2002
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/25/2002
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/25/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/25/2002
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/25/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/25/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/25/2002
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/25/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/2002
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/01/2002
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2002
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/01/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 05/01/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/01/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/07/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/07/2002
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/09/2002
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/14/2002
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/22/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/22/2002
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/22/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/22/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/04/2002
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/04/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/11/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/11/2002
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/11/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/11/2002
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/11/2002
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/11/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/11/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/11/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/20/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/20/2002
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/24/2002
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/24/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/24/2002
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/24/2002
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/24/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/09/2002
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/09/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/09/2002
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/09/2002
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/16/2002
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/16/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/16/2002
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/23/2002
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/23/2002
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/23/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/23/2002
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/23/2002
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/23/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/25/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/25/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/25/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/04/2002
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/04/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 09/04/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/04/2002
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/19/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/01/2002