Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/27/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/27/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/27/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/24/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/06/2002
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 02/07/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/07/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/12/2002
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/26/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/26/2002
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/22/2002