Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/26/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/09/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/20/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/24/2001