Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/20/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/20/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/29/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/29/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/29/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/01/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/01/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/12/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/21/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/26/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/11/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/11/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/11/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/11/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 07/11/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/18/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/24/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/26/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/10/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/24/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/03/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/03/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/20/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/23/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/14/2002