Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/21/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/21/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/25/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/16/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/19/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/04/2002