Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/21/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/16/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/16/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/16/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/16/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/05/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/05/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/21/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/21/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/21/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/27/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/27/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/19/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/19/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/14/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/14/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/14/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/14/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/14/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/14/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/14/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/14/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 09/14/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/14/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/14/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 09/14/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/14/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/14/2001