Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/30/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/07/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/07/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/07/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/07/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/07/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/08/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/11/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/11/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/11/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/11/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/27/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/24/2002
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/24/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 01/24/2002
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/07/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/07/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/12/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/04/2002
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 09/04/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/04/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/04/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/24/2002