Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 03/27/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 03/27/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/26/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/26/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/09/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/14/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/19/2002