Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/28/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 03/28/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/04/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/04/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/01/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/01/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/01/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/01/2001
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/01/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/24/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/24/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/24/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/21/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/21/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/21/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/19/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/19/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/19/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/19/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/19/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/19/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 08/02/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/09/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/09/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/09/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/09/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/09/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/09/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 10/09/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/20/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/05/2002
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/11/2002
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/08/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/08/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/20/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/18/2002