Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/01/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 06/05/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/18/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/28/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/10/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/19/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/26/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/26/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/26/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/13/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/18/2002
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/30/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2002
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/22/2002