Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/02/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/02/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 05/21/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/21/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/21/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/23/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/26/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/20/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/16/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/16/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/16/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 11/01/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 11/08/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 11/13/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/13/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/13/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 11/15/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/15/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 11/15/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/15/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/15/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/27/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/27/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/04/2001