Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/27/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/27/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/27/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 03/30/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/30/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/30/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/30/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/02/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/15/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/13/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/13/2002
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/26/2002
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/26/2002
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/26/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 02/26/2002
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/26/2002
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/26/2002
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 02/28/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/28/2002
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/28/2002
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 02/28/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/12/2002
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/12/2002
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/18/2002
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/18/2002
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/19/2002
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/19/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/09/2002
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/09/2002
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/10/2002
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/10/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/10/2002
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/10/2002
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/10/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/10/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/10/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/10/2002
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/10/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/10/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/17/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/17/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/17/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/17/2002
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/17/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 04/25/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/15/2002
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/15/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/15/2002
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/05/2002
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/05/2002
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/19/2002
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/27/2002
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/27/2002
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 06/27/2002
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/27/2002
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/27/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/27/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/08/2002
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/08/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/08/2002
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/09/2002
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/09/2002
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/09/2002
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 07/09/2002
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/09/2002
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/09/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/09/2002
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/09/2002
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 07/09/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/09/2002
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/09/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/09/2002
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/09/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/09/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/09/2002
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/09/2002
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/09/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/09/2002
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/09/2002
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/15/2002
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/15/2002
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/15/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/2002
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/22/2002
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/22/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/22/2002
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/22/2002
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/22/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/22/2002
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/05/2002
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/05/2002
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 09/05/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/05/2002