Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/27/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/27/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/27/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/28/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/28/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/24/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/22/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/25/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/13/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/13/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/21/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/12/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 07/19/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/01/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/10/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/10/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/12/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/07/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 11/07/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/28/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/28/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 11/28/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/26/2002
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/24/2002
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/08/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew