Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/22/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/01/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/10/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/02/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/25/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/10/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/20/2002