Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/22/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/28/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/26/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 04/26/2001
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/26/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/26/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 05/01/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/08/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/08/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/15/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/15/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/17/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/21/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 05/23/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/23/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/23/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/05/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/05/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/12/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/13/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/21/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/28/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/24/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 08/01/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/05/2001