Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/27/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/27/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/27/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 06/27/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/02/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 10/02/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/02/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/02/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/02/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 10/02/2001
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/02/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 10/02/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/02/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/02/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/02/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/02/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/02/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/02/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/02/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-32] 10/02/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/02/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/02/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/02/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/02/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/02/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 10/02/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/02/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/02/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/02/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/02/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/02/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/02/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/02/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 10/02/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/02/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/10/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/10/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/22/2002
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/22/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/22/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/22/2002
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/22/2002
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/10/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/10/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew