Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/25/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/25/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 04/25/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/25/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/25/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/26/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/26/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/09/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/09/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/09/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/09/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/24/2001