Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/03/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 01/30/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 01/30/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 01/30/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 01/30/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/30/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 01/30/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/30/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 01/30/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/30/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 01/30/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 01/30/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/30/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/30/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 01/30/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 01/30/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/30/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 01/30/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/30/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/30/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/30/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 01/30/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 01/30/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 01/30/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/30/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 01/30/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 01/30/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 02/06/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/06/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/06/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 02/06/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/06/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/06/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 02/06/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/06/2001
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/06/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/06/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/06/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/06/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/06/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/06/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/14/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 02/14/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/14/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 02/14/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/14/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/14/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/14/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/14/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/14/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 02/14/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/14/2001
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/28/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/28/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/28/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/28/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/28/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/06/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/06/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/08/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 03/08/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 03/08/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/08/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/27/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/27/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/27/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/27/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/27/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/01/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/01/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/01/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/01/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/10/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/06/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/12/2001
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/06/2002