There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

American Health Security Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for health care for every American and to control the cost and enhance the quality of the health care system.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/22/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
05/07/2002Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2111-2112)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on the Civil Service and Agency Organization.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
04/04/2001Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
Action By: House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel
04/04/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/02/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/29/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/22/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Government Reform, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (28)


Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/22/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/02/2001 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/22/2001 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health03/29/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform03/22/2001 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service and Agency Organization04/16/2001 Referred to
House Armed Services03/22/2001 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel04/04/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1200.


Subjects (194)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1200. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/2001)

American Health Security Act of 2001 - Establishes the American Health Security Program to be administered by the States. Requires a State to establish a State health security program (program) to receive Federal health care funding.

Entitles every individual who is a U.S. resident and is a U.S. citizen or national or a lawful resident alien to benefits under a program. Makes benefits portable.

Supersedes titles XVIII (Medicare) and XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act, the Federal Employees Health Benefits Program, and the Civilian Health and Medical Program of the Uniformed Services (CHAMPUS).

Prohibits: (1) deductibles, coinsurance, or copayments for acute care and preventive benefits, subject to exception; (2) providers from charging a patient for covered services; and (3) duplicative private insurance.

Considers a health care provider to be qualified if the provider is licensed or certified and meets State law requirements, Federal requirements, and additional standards specified by the Board.

Establishes the American Health Security Standards Board (the Board) to develop policies and procedures for enrollment, benefits, provider participation, national and State funding levels, assisting programs with planning for capital expenditures and service delivery, and other functions. Mandates uniform reporting standards.

Establishes the American Health Security Quality Council to review and evaluate: (1) practice guidelines; (2) standards of quality, performance measures, and medical review criteria; and (3) develop minimum competence criteria.

Directs the Board to establish a national health security budget specifying the total expenditures to be made by the Federal Government and the States for covered health care services.

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to create the American Health Security Trust Fund and appropriates to the Fund specified tax liabilities and current health program receipts.