Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/04/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/27/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/07/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/20/2001
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/20/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 12/20/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/07/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/07/2002
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/07/2002
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/30/2002
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/18/2002