Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/04/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/17/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/17/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/07/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 12/20/2001
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 12/20/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/23/2002
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/23/2002
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/04/2002
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/12/2002
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/13/2002
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/07/2002
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/13/2002
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/13/2002
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/09/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/09/2002
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/11/2002