Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 01/31/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/31/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/06/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/06/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/14/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/14/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 02/14/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/14/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/26/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/26/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/02/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/09/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/24/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/24/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/24/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/24/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/25/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/13/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/13/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/13/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/14/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/21/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/21/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/21/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/26/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/28/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/12/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/12/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/24/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/24/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/24/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/24/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/01/2001
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/01/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 08/01/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/06/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/25/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/05/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 11/28/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/08/2002