Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/04/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/10/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/25/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/07/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/07/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/07/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/07/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/07/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/07/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/07/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/14/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/14/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/14/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/14/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/14/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/14/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/14/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/14/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/21/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/21/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/28/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/12/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/12/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/20/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/20/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/20/2001
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/26/2001
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/26/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/26/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/27/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/27/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/02/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/14/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/14/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/16/2001