Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/29/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/03/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/24/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/01/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/01/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/23/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/25/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/06/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 08/02/2001