Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/27/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/03/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/03/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/03/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/03/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/03/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/03/2001
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/03/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/04/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/04/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/04/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/04/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/24/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/24/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 04/24/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/01/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/08/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/08/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/05/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/05/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/13/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/31/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/02/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/05/2001