Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/27/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/27/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/29/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/29/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/29/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/29/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/24/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/24/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/05/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/05/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/06/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/12/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/12/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/13/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/10/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/19/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/23/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/05/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 09/05/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/05/2001
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/20/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/02/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/05/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/09/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/09/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/11/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 10/16/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/08/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/08/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 11/08/2001