Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 03/28/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/25/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/25/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/25/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/25/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/25/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/25/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/25/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/01/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/01/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/02/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/02/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/03/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/08/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/09/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/09/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/15/2001
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/17/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/22/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/24/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/24/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 06/05/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/07/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/12/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/12/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/12/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/20/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/20/2001
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/25/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/25/2001
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/25/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/25/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/27/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/27/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/27/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/27/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 07/11/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/17/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/17/2001
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/17/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/17/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/20/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/20/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew