Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/28/2001
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7]* 03/28/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/28/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/28/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/28/2001
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/03/2001
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/26/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/08/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/08/2001
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/25/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/27/2001

Show cosponsors who withdrew