Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 01/30/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 01/30/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/06/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/28/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 03/01/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/07/2001