Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/24/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/25/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/25/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/26/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/26/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/26/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/03/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/10/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/10/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/21/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/21/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/22/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/24/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/24/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/07/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/07/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/13/2001
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/14/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/14/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/14/2001
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/18/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 06/18/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 06/18/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/19/2001