There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Homeland Security Strategy Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the President to develop and implement a strategy for homeland security.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/29/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date
08/10/2001Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from DOD.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
04/24/2001Joint Hearing Held by the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management and by the Subcommittee on National Security, Veteran's Affairs and International Relations (Government Reform).
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
04/19/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/04/2001Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/30/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/29/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2001Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/29/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/09/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/16/2001

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services03/29/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/29/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/30/2001 Referred to
04/24/2001 Hearings by
House Judiciary03/29/2001 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime04/19/2001 Referred to
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)03/29/2001 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1292.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1292. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/29/2001)

Homeland Security Strategy Act of 2001 - Directs the President to: (1) develop a comprehensive strategy for homeland security (protection from terrorist or strategic attacks) under which Federal, State, and local government organizations coordinate and cooperate to meet security objectives; (2) conduct a comprehensive threat and risk assessment to identify specific homeland security threats; (3) implement the resulting strategy as soon as practicable; (4) designate a single Government official responsible for homeland security; and (5) ensure that the strategy is carried out through the heads of appropriate executive departments and agencies.

Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget to restructure appropriations accounts as necessary to carry out organizational and operational changes to meet such strategy.