Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/04/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/27/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/27/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/27/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/27/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/27/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/27/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/27/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/27/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/27/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/27/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/27/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/03/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/03/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/03/2001
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/08/2001
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/08/2001
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/21/2001
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/10/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/10/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/20/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/24/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/24/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 01/23/2002