Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/16/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/16/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/16/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/23/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/06/2002
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 02/08/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/08/2002
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/08/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/08/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/08/2002
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/08/2002
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/08/2002
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/08/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/08/2002
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/08/2002
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/08/2002
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/11/2002
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/11/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/11/2002
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/11/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2002
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/09/2002
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/09/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/15/2002
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/23/2002
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 04/23/2002
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/23/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/23/2002
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/24/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/24/2002
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/24/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/07/2002