Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/03/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/03/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/03/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/03/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/24/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/24/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 04/26/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/03/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/09/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/12/2002