Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/03/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/03/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/01/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/01/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/01/2001
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/03/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/03/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/03/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/09/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/09/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/09/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/09/2001
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/09/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/09/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/09/2001
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/16/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/16/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/16/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/23/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2001
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/23/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/05/2001
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/26/2001
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/26/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/26/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/26/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/12/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/19/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/23/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 07/27/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/02/2001
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/02/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/05/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/06/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/08/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/10/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/13/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 01/23/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 01/23/2002
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/06/2002
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/06/2002
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 03/11/2002
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/11/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/11/2002
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/11/2002
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/11/2002
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/11/2002
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/11/2002
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/11/2002
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2002
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/12/2002
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/12/2002
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/19/2002
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/09/2002
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/09/2002
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/25/2002
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/05/2002
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/11/2002
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/17/2002
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/09/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/09/2002
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/08/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 10/08/2002
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 10/15/2002
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/15/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/28/2002