Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/08/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 05/08/2001
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-27] 06/20/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/20/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/21/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/11/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/07/2002
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/21/2002
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/22/2002
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/11/2002
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/17/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew