Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/02/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/02/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/05/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/22/2002

Show cosponsors who withdrew