Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/29/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/02/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 11/27/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 12/13/2001
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/05/2002
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/05/2002
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/05/2002
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/13/2002
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/13/2002
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 02/13/2002
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/13/2002
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/18/2002
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/24/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2002
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/05/2002
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/25/2002
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/10/2002
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/10/2002
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/19/2002
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/13/2002