Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/29/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Acevedo-Vila, Anibal [D-PR-At Large] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/24/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/07/2001
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/09/2002
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/09/2002
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/09/2002
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/11/2002
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/23/2002
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/23/2002
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/23/2002
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/23/2002
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/02/2002
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/02/2002
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 05/02/2002
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/23/2002
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/2002
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/24/2002
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/26/2002
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/01/2002