Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/03/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 04/03/2001
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/24/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/24/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/25/2001
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/26/2001
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-49] 04/26/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/03/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/08/2001
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/14/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/23/2001
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/25/2001
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2001
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/23/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/27/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/05/2001
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/12/2001
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/19/2001