Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/04/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/25/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/25/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/02/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/02/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/02/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/02/2001
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/02/2001
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/14/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/14/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/14/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 05/14/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/23/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/23/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/23/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 05/24/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/07/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/14/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 07/25/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/25/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/12/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/08/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 11/29/2001
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/29/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1] 11/30/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/05/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 12/13/2001
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/24/2002
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/24/2002
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/24/2002
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/24/2002
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/12/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/26/2002
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/11/2002
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/11/2002
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/18/2002
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/25/2002
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/11/2002
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/20/2002
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/10/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/10/2002
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/23/2002
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/25/2002
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/11/2002
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/25/2002
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/08/2002
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-2] 10/10/2002