There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Clean Power Plant Act of 2001

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reduce emissions of mercury, carbon dioxide, nitrogen oxides, and sulfur dioxide from fossil fuel-fired electric utility generating units operating in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/03/2001Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date
06/20/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/24/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy, Technology and Economic Growth, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
04/24/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
04/18/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards.
Action By: Committee on Science
04/18/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Action By: Committee on Science
04/16/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/04/2001Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
04/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2001Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, Financial Services, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/03/2001Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/03/2001 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Air Quality04/16/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce04/03/2001 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness06/20/2001 Referred to
House Financial Services04/03/2001 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity04/24/2001 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic Monetary Policy, Technology, and Economic Growth04/24/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/03/2001 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit04/04/2001 Referred to
House Science04/03/2001 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Energy04/18/2001 Referred to
House Science Subcommittee on Environment, Technology, and Standards04/18/2001 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1335. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/03/2001)

Clean Power Plant Act of 2001 - Amends the Clean Air Act to require specified emissions limitations on mercury, sulfur dioxide, and nitrogen oxides (NOx) from fossil fuel-fired electric generating units with a nameplate capacity of at least 15 megawatts that use a combustion device primarily to generate electricity for sale.

Requires quarterly pollutant-specific emission reports for such pollutants and for carbon dioxide (CO2) by unit owners or operators. Directs the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency to publish facility-specific emission data.

Requires regulations for disclosure of data concerning emissions levels.

Directs the Administrator to calculate a generation performance standard for CO2 from covered fossil fuel-fired electric generating units and allocate allowances among such units.

Authorizes the carryover and trading of unused allowances and requires surrender to the Administrator of a number of CO2 allowances equal to the total tonnage emitted during the calendar year. Permits the performance standard to be exceeded if the plant has sufficient emissions credits. Imposes an excess emissions penalty and requires units to offset such emissions.

Requires regulations concerning transfer of hazards associated with combustion from one medium to another and release of hazardous wastes into the environment.

Expresses the sense of Congress concerning crediting permanent CO2 and NOx emissions reductions to the utility sector in any enacted climate change implementation program.

Authorizes appropriations for industry and community assistance and development of a carbon sequestration strategy.

Requires grants to municipalities in which there are located fossil fuel-fired electric generating units that: (1) provide ten percent or more of the municipality's annual property tax revenue in the last fiscal year ending before this Act's enactment; and (2) cease operation after this Act's enactment.

Includes hazardous air pollutants from electric utility steam generating units on a list of such pollutants from major and area sources required under the Clean Air Act.