Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/03/2001
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/03/2001
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/04/2001
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/04/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/04/2001
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/24/2001
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/01/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/08/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/08/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/08/2001
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/08/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/08/2001
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/15/2001
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/21/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/19/2001
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2001
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/21/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/21/2001
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/21/2001
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/11/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/11/2001
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/11/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/11/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/16/2001
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 12/06/2001
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/20/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 06/24/2002