Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/01/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/01/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/15/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/15/2001
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 05/15/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/15/2001
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/05/2001
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 06/05/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/05/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/12/2001
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/12/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/12/2001
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/12/2001
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/12/2001
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/12/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/13/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/13/2001
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/19/2001
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/19/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/19/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/19/2001
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/19/2001
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/26/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/26/2001
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-48] 06/26/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/26/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/26/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/26/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/26/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/12/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/31/2001
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/31/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/01/2001
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 08/01/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/01/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 08/01/2001
Rep. Carson, Brad [D-OK-2] 08/01/2001
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/02/2001
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 08/02/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 08/02/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 08/02/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/02/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 08/02/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/05/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/05/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/05/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/05/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/05/2001
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/12/2001
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/12/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/12/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/10/2001
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/14/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/06/2001
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/06/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 12/19/2001
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 04/16/2002
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/30/2002
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/25/2002
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 10/02/2002