Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-1]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/25/2001
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/01/2001
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/01/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/16/2001
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/17/2001
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/22/2001
Rep. Grucci, Felix J., Jr. [R-NY-1] 05/22/2001
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/22/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/22/2001
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/06/2001
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/12/2001
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/27/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/27/2001