Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/03/2001
Rep. Schrock, Edward L. [R-VA-2] 04/04/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/04/2001
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/04/2001
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/24/2001
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/01/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/01/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/01/2001
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/03/2001
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/03/2001
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/03/2001
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/03/2001
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/03/2001
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/09/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/09/2001
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/09/2001
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/09/2001
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-31] 05/09/2001
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/15/2001
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/15/2001
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/15/2001
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/15/2001
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/15/2001
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/21/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/21/2001
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/21/2001
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/21/2001
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 06/05/2001
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/05/2001
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/05/2001
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/05/2001
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/05/2001
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/07/2001
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 06/19/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/28/2001
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/28/2001
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 06/28/2001
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/28/2001
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/28/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/28/2001
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/28/2001
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/28/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-2] 07/10/2001
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/10/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/10/2001
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/10/2001
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/11/2001
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/11/2001
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/11/2001
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 07/11/2001
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/17/2001
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 07/17/2001
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/17/2001
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/17/2001
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/17/2001
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/18/2001
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/18/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2001
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/19/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/23/2001
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/23/2001
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/23/2001
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/26/2001
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 07/26/2001
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/27/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/30/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 08/02/2001
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/02/2001
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 08/02/2001
Rep. Kerns, Brian D. [R-IN-7] 09/10/2001
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/14/2001
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/21/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/21/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/02/2001
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/09/2001
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/08/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 12/04/2001
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/04/2001
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 12/06/2001
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 12/18/2001
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/20/2001
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 01/24/2002
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/05/2002
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/05/2002
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/18/2002