Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/24/2001
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/24/2001
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/24/2001
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/24/2001
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/24/2001
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/24/2001
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2001
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/01/2001
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/01/2001
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/01/2001
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/01/2001
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/01/2001
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/01/2001
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/01/2001
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/01/2001
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/09/2001
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/09/2001
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/09/2001
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/09/2001
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/22/2001
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/22/2001
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2001
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/22/2001
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/05/2001
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/05/2001
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/05/2001
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/05/2001
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/14/2001
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 06/14/2001
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/19/2001
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/19/2001
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/19/2001
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/19/2001
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/19/2001
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/25/2001
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/25/2001
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/25/2001
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/25/2001
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/25/2001
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/10/2001
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/10/2001
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/10/2001
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/10/2001
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/19/2001
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/25/2001
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 08/01/2001
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2001